This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/31/2022 at 15:34:06 (UTC).

VILLA, JUAN et al.vs.AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 VILLA, JUAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************73-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUAN VILLA

IDA VILLA

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON THOMASSY

Defendant Attorney

DARRYL BECKMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INS COMP

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INS COMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gionis and Lilly, PLLC; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beckman, Darryl Scott