This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/10/2021 at 20:20:06 (UTC).

VIAD CORPvs.CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON et al.

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 VIAD CORPvs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa T. Munyon and John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************28-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lisa T. Munyon

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIAD CORP

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

EQUITAS INSURANCE LIMITED

CERTAIN LONDON MARKET INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID SIMMONS

Defendant Attorneys

FREDERICK WERMUTH

MARY MEEKS

 

Court Documents

Order Staying Proceedings

Order Staying Proceedings

Acceptance of Service

Acceptance of Service; Comments: of process of complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: WAIVERS OF SERVICE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: CASE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

Order Setting Case Management Conference

Order Setting Case Management Conference; Comments: 7/13/2020 10:15

Notice to Parties

Notice to Parties

Order of Reassignment

Order of Reassignment; Comments: to Div 43

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: "B"

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of; Comments: LLOYDS UNDERWRITERS

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Staying Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance of Service; Comments: of process of complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: WAIVERS OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: CASE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; Comments: 7/13/2020 10:15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Reassignment; Comments: to Div 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s); Comments: "B"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of; Comments: LLOYDS UNDERWRITERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Christina Leah Buffington; Amount: -400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERTAIN LONDON MARKET COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Dial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant