Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 16:28:56 (UTC).

VERONICA NICOLE JAMESvs.VINCENT MAKOTO SHIMADA

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 VERONICA NICOLE JAMESvs VINCENT MAKOTO SHIMADA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONICA NICOLE JAMES

Defendant

VINCENT MAKOTO SHIMADA

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Application for Determination of Civil Indigent Status

Application for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Comments: NON INDIGENT

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLTF

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRefer to Modria Online Dispute Resolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: JAMES, VERONICA NICOLE; Amount: -313.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Civil Indigent Status; Comments: NON INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less