This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/20/2021 at 15:57:00 (UTC).

VENTURA CHIROPRACTIC LLC vs. OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 VENTURA CHIROPRACTIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VENTURA CHIROPRACTIC LLC

JUSTIN RICHARDS AAO

Defendant

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW AUNGST

Defendant Attorney

JOHN HEILMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: electronic delivery 9/27/21

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONSOLIDATE

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: electronic delivery 9/27/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Matthew Aungst; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA CHIROPRACTIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEILMAN JOHN W