This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 15:06:49 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLCvs.ROBERTO MAMBRU

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLCvs ROBERTO MAMBRU was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

PROSPER FUNDING LLC OF WEBBANK AAO

Defendant

ROBERTO MAMBRU

Orlando, FL 32835-6659

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA FAGEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Served 11/19/21 3:00 pm spouse of Roberto Mambru

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: Emailed atty

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: Emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Served 11/19/21 3:00 pm spouse of Roberto Mambru

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica J Fagen; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prosper Funding (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J