Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/06/2021 at 16:40:27 (UTC).

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC vs. OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE CONSULTANTS INC

VELOCITY CHIROPRACTIC DBA

GOLDEN BROOKS GUD

SHANEKA BROOKS AAO

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

AUGUST MANGENEY

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES- OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES- OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VELOCITY CHIROPRACTIC is a litigant

Latest cases where VELOCITY ALTERNATIVE MEDICAL CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant