This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/15/2022 at 15:36:45 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITSvs.GOLDENI ENTERPRISES INC et al.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITSvs GOLDENI ENTERPRISES INC was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS

Defendants

GOLDENI ENTERPRISES INC

THE ENCLAVE AT OXFORD PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLAND MEDLEY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COUNTS I AND II OF THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: COUNTS I AND II OF THE COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kathleen M Roberts; Amount: -957.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 957.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Medley, Ashland Roberts, ESQ.