This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/14/2023 at 16:13:36 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2023 UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************15-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY ORTHOPEDIC CARE

TILISA GIBSON AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

Defendant Attorney

BELINDA RIVERA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Memorandum

Memorandum

Motion for Default & Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default & Motion for Default Judgment

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: 3/30/23

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: 3/30/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Motion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: RODRIGUEZ, EDUARDO; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less