This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 15:48:42 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLCvs.HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLCvs HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE C was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC

KRISTAL FADEM AAO

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA

Defendants

HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

HARTFORD UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL PETRI

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: & NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: served

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: service of process & original summons

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Correspondence

Correspondence

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY,

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: & NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: service of process & original summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant