This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/11/2022 at 17:03:25 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLCvs.GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLCvs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC

SARAH PORTER AAO

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLAND DBA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTIN PRESSER

 

Court Documents

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INS CO

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: to defendant

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUSTIN PRESSER