This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 16:05:49 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************11-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC

KELLEY POPKOWSKI AAO

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA

Defendants

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS FERREIRO

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND 2.516 DESIGNATION

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NO ATTACHMENT

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND 2.516 DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NO ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant