This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/22/2022 at 15:49:50 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC

KELSEY ROGERS AAO

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

DAVID GAGNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY-June 2, 2022

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY-June 2, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant