This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/21/2022 at 16:00:54 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC vs. SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC

JOSEPH MIRAGLIA AAO

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREGORY GUDIN

FAUSTINO ESTOY

Defendant Attorney

ASHLEY VENEGAS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/3/22 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/2/22 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/2/22 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 2/3/22 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VENEGAS, ASHLEY