This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/17/2022 at 16:09:53 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK PLLC

MIKE JAQUANTAY AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIM SNEDAKER

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN FLOYD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Snedaker Law; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC D/B/A UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ORLANDO A/A/O DIANA COLELLIE is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN FLOYD