This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/07/2022 at 15:40:13 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INCvs.ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INCvs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC

SANDRA GARRETT AAO

ADVENTHEALTH TAMPA DBA

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA REHER

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Letter

Letter

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: and demand for jury trial

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: and demand for jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: REHER, AMANDA HUNTER; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University Community Hospital, Inc., D/B/A Florida Hospital Tampa is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO