This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/15/2022 at 16:47:05 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INCvs.GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INCvs GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC

JUAN MARTIN AAO

ADVENTHEALTH TAMPA DBA

Defendant

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

KATY MELCHIORRE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Letter

Letter

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO COMPLY WITH STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN / ORDER

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.310(b)(6)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.310(b)(6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO COMPLY WITH STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN / ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ALEXANDER, DAVID BRANNON; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University Community Hospital, Inc., D/B/A Florida Hospital Tampa is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID ALEXANDER