This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/08/2022 at 16:04:32 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC vs. DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIVERSITY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC

MARQUIEL JACKSON AAO

ADVENTHEALTH TAMPA DBA

Defendant

DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK CEDERBERG

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA CLARK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Letter

Letter

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NO ATTACHMENT)

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NO ATTACHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Attorney Issued Summon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CEDERBERG, MARK A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University Community Hospital, Inc., D/B/A Florida Hospital Tampa is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIRYLAND INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK CEDERBERG