This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/23/2021 at 23:14:44 (UTC).

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATIONvs.TOTAL PROPERTY MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING LLC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATIONvs TOTAL PROPERTY MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING LLC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Defendant

TOTAL PROPERTY MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD MAHFOUZ

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: TOTAL PROPERTY MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING II LLC

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed attorney

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Hearing Room/Courtroom 370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: TOTAL PROPERTY MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Clerkin and Sinclair LLP; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.