This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2023 at 11:07:46 (UTC).

TRYBA, AMANDAvs.UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 TRYBA, AMANDAvs UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMANDA TRYBA

Defendant

UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN STEFANIK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Universal City Dev Partners Ltd

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Universal City Dev Partners Ltd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WOLFSON, JONAH MICHAEL; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WOLFSON, JONAH MICHAEL; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: TRYBA, AMANDA; Amount: -400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less