This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/06/2022 at 15:31:58 (UTC).

TRUIST BANKvs.WILLIE WILLIAMS, SANDRA WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 05/07/2022 TRUIST BANKvs WILLIE WILLIAMS, SANDRA WILLIAMS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUIST BANK

SUNTRUST BANK AST

LIGHTSTREAM DBA

Defendants

WILLIE WILLIAMS

SANDRA WILLIAMS

Apopka, FL 32703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALPH MARCADIS

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: FOR ACCETANCE OF SERVICE

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Comments: FOR ACCETANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ralph Marcadis Esquire; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIGHTSTREAM is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ