This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/08/2023 at 15:41:55 (UTC).

TRUIST BANKvs.MIKE THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 TRUIST BANKvs MIKE THOMPSON was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************97-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUIST BANK

LIGHTSTREAM DBA

SUNTRUST BANK SBM

Defendant

MIKE THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALPH MARCADIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: MIKE THOMPSON

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed atty

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: MIKE THOMPSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MARCADIS SINGER PA; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less