This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/01/2022 at 15:32:18 (UTC).

TRIOLO, PETER CHARLESvs.NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORLANDO INC A FLORIDA et al.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2021 TRIOLO, PETER CHARLESvs NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORLANDO INC A FLORIDA was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A James Craner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A James Craner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER CHARLES TRIOLO

Defendants

NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORLANDO INC A FLORIDA

HOWARD HARRISON

MICHAEL INNISS

CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIE(S) WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE, WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES, HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWEN SOKOLOF

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD STORFER

 

Court Documents

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk

Answer

Answer

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORLANDO INC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: HOWARD HARRISON

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MICHAEL INNISS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate

Certificate

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORALNDO INC, HOWARD HARRISON, MICHAEL INNISS, AND CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: NEW BEGINNINGS CHURCH OF ORLANDO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: HOWARD HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MICHAEL INNISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Owen Harvey Sokolof; Amount: -1955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where De Lage Landen Financial Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Storfer, Richard B