This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/04/2023 at 23:11:04 (UTC).

TRINH NGUYENvs.CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/30/2022 TRINH NGUYENvs CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRINH NGUYEN

Defendants

CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC

CREDIT COLLECTIONS SERVICES DBA

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CHANTEL WONDER

LATASHA SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Mandated Case Management Plan/Order - General Track

Mandated Case Management Plan/Order - General Track; Comments: County Civil

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATON OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FILED BY DEFT, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FILED BY DEFT, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATON OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kevin L. Lewis; Amount: -20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandated Case Management Plan/Order - General Track; Comments: County Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kevin L. Lewis; Amount: -320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less