This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/09/2019 at 10:04:40 (UTC).

TORRES, GUILLERMO Aet al. vs. VOGELS, ANDREA Wet al.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 TORRES, GUILLERMO A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOGELS, ANDREA W. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet C Thorpe and Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************14-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Janet C Thorpe

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JENNIFER SIERRA

GUILLERMO A TORRES

Defendants

KARI GANN DBA GANN REALTY GROUP LLC

ANDREA W VOGELS

DIVINE AND ESTES PA AS AGENT FOR OLD REPUBLIC

KARI GANN

DIVINE AND ESTES PA

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

KARI GANN DBA THE PROPERTIE SHOPPE

THE PROPERTIE SHOPPE LLC DBA

OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY AGT

GANN REALTY GROUP DBA

MICHAEL VERGARA AS MGR OF MAVERICK INSPECTION SER

GANN REALTY GROUP LLC FKA PROPERTIE SHOPPE LLC

MAVERICK INSPECTION SERVICES LLC

MICHAEL VERGARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOFFREY STAHL

Defendant Attorneys

BRANDON DEGEL

KARLA VALLADARES

MYA HATCHETTE

DEREK LLOYD

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Amended Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing; Comments: on 2/12/19 at 9:15am

Response

Response; Comments: TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE ATTORNEYS FEES

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Response

Response; Comments: AND NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ. S MOTION OF WITHDRAWAL OF HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Wednesday, January 9th, 2019 at 8:30 AM ET

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw; Comments: OF HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ. (WITH CLIENT'S CONSENT)

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Mail Returned - Not Delivered

Mail Returned - Not Delivered

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • HEARING - Motion - Carsten, Keith A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Hearing; Comments: on 2/12/19 at 9:15am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response; Comments: TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, AND TO STRIKE ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • HEARING - Ex Parte - Carsten, Keith A (Actual: Carsten, Keith A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response; Comments: AND NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ. S MOTION OF WITHDRAWAL OF HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing; Comments: Wednesday, January 9th, 2019 at 8:30 AM ET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Withdraw; Comments: OF HEW LAW PLLC AND JESSICA K. HEW, ESQ. (WITH CLIENT'S CONSENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: STAHL, GEOFFREY S; Amount: -30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Geoff S. Stahl; Amount: -475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Old Republic National Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDON DEGEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek H Lloyd (esq)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATCHETTE MYA M