This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/24/2022 at 10:59:17 (UTC).

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS vs. BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS

JAMES VILFORT AAO

Defendant

BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW QUATTROCHI

Defendant Attorney

TAISHA EASTERLING

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: & DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLTF

Letter

Letter; Comments: Exhibit A Attached

Letter

Letter; Comments: Exhibit A & B Attached

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO DEEM PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ADMITTED & Exhibit A Attached

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO DEEM PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ADMITTED & Exhibit A Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Exhibit A & B Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Exhibit A Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: & DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MATTHEW QUATTROCHI; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Wellness Center Of Fort Myers is a litigant

Latest cases where BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA