This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/02/2022 at 15:54:06 (UTC).

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************08-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC

JACKSON AMBEAU AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW QUATTROCHI

Defendant Attorney

ALEXIS TUCKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: administrative order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Letter

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MATTHEW QUATTROCHI; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: administrative order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Wellness Center Of Fort Myers is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant