This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/23/2022 at 23:50:02 (UTC).

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************57-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC

CASSANDRA N RAYBON AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW QUATTROCHI

Defendant Attorney

SARAH EDWARDS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: COUNT II- DECLARATORY RELIEF

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: COUNT II- DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MATTHEW QUATTROCHI; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Wellness Center Of Fort Myers is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH EDWARDS