This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/31/2021 at 15:55:15 (UTC).

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************60-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC AAO GISELE

TITAN WELLNESS CENTER OF FORT MYERS LLC

GISELE DOREUS AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW QUATTROCHI

Defendant Attorney

RONALDA STEVENS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Letter

Letter

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: QUATTROCHI, MATTHEW CHARLES; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Wellness Center Of Fort Myers is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW QUATTROCHI