This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/02/2023 at 21:43:07 (UTC).

THOMAS, CARA vs. CHARLES SCHWAB AND CO INC

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 THOMAS, CARA filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES SCHWAB AND CO INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret H Schreiber. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret H Schreiber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARA THOMAS

Defendant

CHARLES SCHWAB AND CO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER FARRAR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Petition

Petition; Comments: TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: & Close Case

Correspondence

Correspondence

Final Order

Final Order; Comments: on Unopposed Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Order; Comments: on Unopposed Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: & Close Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Farrar Law PLLC; Amount: -400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition; Comments: TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less