Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/30/2019 at 15:35:02 (UTC).

THE PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INCvs.SPENCE, PAULA M et al.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 THE PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INCvs SPENCE, PAULA M was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

PAULA M SPENCE

THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE AKA

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

PHIL DIAMOND ORANGE COUNTY COMPTROLLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISA MURIEL

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • Service Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: no return of service received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: LM Funding; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: LM Funding; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURIEL , MELISA