This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/28/2021 at 15:35:55 (UTC).

THE EQUITYMAX INC 401K PLANvs.LASTRES, ANGEL L et al.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 THE EQUITYMAX INC 401K PLANvs LASTRES, ANGEL L was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE EQUITYMAX INC 401K PLAN

Defendants

ANGEL L LASTRES

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM TRECO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: served angel l lastres 10/14/21

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON SERVICE AND SUMMONS- UNKNOWN TENANT

Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Withdrawal; Comments: OF VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

Motion to Vacate

Motion to Vacate

Order Setting Aside

Order Setting Aside; Comments: Clerk's default

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside; Comments: Clerk's default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Comments: OF VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON SERVICE AND SUMMONS- UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: served angel l lastres 10/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: TRECO, WILLIAM ANDREW; Amount: -20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Tepps Treco; Amount: -905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equitymax Inc Pension Plan is a litigant