Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 15:41:48 (UTC).

THE ENCLAVE AT MOSS PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.vs.MARINA V ELLIS, ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS, JEFFREY ALLEN ELLIS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 THE ENCLAVE AT MOSS PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARINA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************14-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE ENCLAVE AT MOSS PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

MARINA V ELLIS

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS

JEFFREY ALLEN ELLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN FONG

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH TAORMINA

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS /OWNERS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: JEFFREY ALLEN ELLIS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: DECLARATION OF COVENANTS AND RESTRICTIONS FOR THE ENCLAVE AT MOSS PARK

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attys

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Complaint

Complaint

Form "A"

Form "A"

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS /OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: JEFFREY ALLEN ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s); Comments: DECLARATION OF COVENANTS AND RESTRICTIONS FOR THE ENCLAVE AT MOSS PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ryan Fong; Amount: -330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 330.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taormina, Joseph Vincent