This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/17/2022 at 16:15:14 (UTC).

THE CIT GROUP COMMERCIAL SERVICES INCvs.US GIFT FACTORY LLC

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 THE CIT GROUP COMMERCIAL SERVICES INCvs US GIFT FACTORY LLC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE CIT GROUP COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendant

US GIFT FACTORY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM LINDEMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: U.S. GIFT FACTORY LLC SERVED

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: U.S. GIFT FACTORY LLC SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: William M Lindeman; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less