This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:06:51 (UTC).

THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************62-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC

AMELIA IRISH AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: Geico Indemnity Company

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less