Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 16:38:05 (UTC).

THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC

BRAYLON DYE AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD LEVASSEUR

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: Geico General Insurance Company

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD LEVASSEUR