This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/12/2019 at 15:35:14 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONvs.HENDRY, ALAN et al.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONvs HENDRY, ALAN was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************38-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA THE BANK OF NEW YO

THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWALT, INC FKA

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

RYESTONE LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

JACK M ARONS

J E JONES CONSTRUCTION COMPANY DBA THE JONES COMPA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

FERN B ARONS

THE MANORS AT BUTLER BAY ASSOCIATION INC

ALAN HENDRY

REMZI ERSAHIN

JOANNE E ERSAHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY CHURCH

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA CHAVEZ

JAHIT KAVURT

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: by RYESTONE, LLC

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served J.E. Jones Construction Company

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer

Answer

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Jack M. Arons

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Fern B. Arons

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: RYESTONE, LLC

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: unknown tenant in possession #1

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: unknown tenant in possession #2

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Tha Manors at Butler Bay Association

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: by RYESTONE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served J.E. Jones Construction Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Jack M. Arons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Fern B. Arons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: RYESTONE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: unknown tenant in possession #1

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Form "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BANK OF AMERICA; Amount: -1992.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1992.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryestone LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Church, Kelley Louise