This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/03/2019 at 15:33:55 (UTC).

TENERY, DAERI vs. RICHARDSON, KRISTOPHERet al.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 TENERY, DAERI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARDSON, KRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************96-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAERI TENERY

Defendants

KRISTOPHER RICHARDSON

RHEA RICHARDSON

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN RUDD

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: served Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: served Amica Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: The Morgan Firm PA D/B/A Morgan & Morgan; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less