This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/24/2022 at 16:55:19 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A.vs.RICHARD R ROEBUCK

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARD R ROEBUCK. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

RICHARD R ROEBUCK

Orlando, FL 32808-1241

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JESSICA FAGEN

JOHN LACZEWSKI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Issued Notice to Appear to the Attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: RICHARD R ROEBUCK SUBSTITUTE SERVE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: RICHARD R ROEBUCK SUBSTITUTE SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Issued Notice to Appear to the Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica J Fagen; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J