This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/10/2023 at 15:45:31 (UTC).

TD BANK NAvs.YENNY DEL PILAR CATELLANOS OVIEDO, KENZO ENRIQUE DE BARRIOS URDANETA

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 TD BANK NAvs YENNY DEL PILAR CATELLANOS OVIEDO, KENZO ENRIQUE DE BARRIOS URDANETA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK NA

Defendants

YENNY DEL PILAR CATELLANOS OVIEDO

Orlando, FL 32837-5248

KENZO ENRIQUE DE BARRIOS URDANETA

Orlando, FL 32837

CATELLANOS, YENNY AKA

DE BARRIOS, KENZO AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS AVRUTIS

Defendant Attorney

MONICA SANTIAGO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANTS

Answer

Answer

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: AVRUTIS, THOMAS LEE; Amount: -420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less