This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/19/2023 at 02:04:34 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANKvs.JODI KELLER

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 SYNCHRONY BANKvs JODI KELLER was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************87-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

JODI KELLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW FORNARO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: 2/17/23

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comments: of account balance

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Comments: of account balance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: 2/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica J Fagen; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less