This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2022 at 11:18:12 (UTC).

SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INCvs.PARKER, ALEX

Case Summary

On 04/24/2021 SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INCvs PARKER, ALEX was filed as a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************61-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPERIOR FENCE AND RAIL INC

Defendant

ALEX PARKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON

Defendant Attorney

JOHN DEMPSEY

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal; Comments: of Amended Complaint

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: in favor of defendant

Letter

Letter

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANT S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND ...

Memorandum

Memorandum

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: on DECEMBER 10, 2021 @ 11:30A.M.

Notice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order

Notice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal; Comments: as to cts I, II with 20 days leave to amend

Letter

Letter

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANT S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal; Comments: of Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: in favor of defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L); Location: Hearing Room 1100.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: on JUNE 22, 2021 @ 11:15am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT - BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: chris johnson; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Fence & Rail Inc is a litigant