This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/22/2023 at 15:44:35 (UTC).

SUPER GREEN AIR CONTROL LLCvs.CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 SUPER GREEN AIR CONTROL LLCvs CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUPER GREEN AIR CONTROL LLC

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

SAMANTHA PRESTON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Addendum to

Addendum to

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE- FILED BY DEFT, CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR TRANSFER FOR IMPROPER VENUE- FILED BY DEFT, CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ENGLAND, WILLIAM SCOTT; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less