This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:40:48 (UTC).

SUNSHINE CHEN TRUSTEEvs.HOLLY ANTUNES, KAITLYN MCBRIDE, JORDAN SINGER, JAICI BRYDEBELL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SUNSHINE CHEN TRUSTEEvs HOLLY ANTUNES, KAITLYN MCBRIDE, JORDAN SINGER, JAICI BRYDEBELL was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSHINE CHEN TRUSTEE

Defendants

KAITLYN MCBRIDE

JAICI BRYDEBELL

JORDAN SINGER

HOLLY ANTUNES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JOSHUA COSSEY

PHILIPPE REVAH

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendant, JORDAN SINGER

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Monday, October 19, 2020, at 10:30 a.m.

Summons Returned Posted

Summons Returned Posted

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I -JORDAN SINGER

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: JORDAN SINGER

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: ORG & COPY TO PLTF

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: EVICTION

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Owners Authorization

Owners Authorization

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendant, JORDAN SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Laurent, Gisela T (Actual: Laurent, Gisela T); Location: Hearing Room/Courtroom 370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Laurent, Gisela T (Actual: Laurent, Gisela T)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Monday, October 19, 2020, at 10:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT I -JORDAN SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: JORDAN SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: SUNSHINE CHEN TRUSTEE; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: ORG & COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOwners Authorization

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less