This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 03:48:30 (UTC).

STEACY, KIMBERLY vs. STEACY, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STEACY, KIMBERLY filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEACY, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************11-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMBERLY STEACY

Respondent

WILLIAM STEACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANIEL SMITH

Respondent Attorney

SAMUEL LEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • HEARING - Injunctions - Wooten, Wayne C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less