This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:19:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - WILLIAMSON, JALEEL ANDRE

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other lawsuit against - WILLIAMSON, JALEEL ANDRE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and David P Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JALEEL ANDRE WILLIAMSON

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Electronic Copy to Bondsman

Electronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: POLAKOFF BAIL BONDS Sent, Oct 8 2020 4:17PM

Complaint Filed Municipal/County Ordinance

Complaint Filed Municipal/County Ordinance

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U520991646

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U520991646

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P); Location: Room 6-B On The 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Jewett, Steve 71677427; Location: Room 4-B On The 4th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPer the Court:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: Court to Enter Final Judgment When Appropriate Final Judgment Is Furnished to the Court by The County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Division; Comments: 61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Johnson, David P (Actual: Johnson, David P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Jewett, Steve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: Recipient: POLAKOFF BAIL BONDS Sent, Oct 8 2020 4:17PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed Municipal/County Ordinance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U520991646

    Read MoreRead Less