This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 10:20:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - WILLEY, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - WILLEY, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Gibson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Elizabeth Gibson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MICHAEL WILLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LYLE MAZIN

 

Court Documents

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Pre-Trial Diversion Rejection

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Demand for Discovery

Demand for Discovery

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND PRE-TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth (Actual: Gibson, Elizabeth)

HEARING - Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth (Actual: Gibson, Elizabeth)

Correspondence

Correspondence

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Notice

Notice

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth (Actual: Gibson, Elizabeth) 71774638; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Held in Abeyance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefendant Referred to PreTrial Diversion; Comments: You will Receive a Letter from Pre-Trial Diversion with Further Instructions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Division; Comments: 80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING - Arraignment - Gibson, Elizabeth (Actual: Gibson, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketTo Be Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYLE MAZIN