This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:21:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - VAZQUEZ, JAINEL FONTES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - VAZQUEZ, JAINEL FONTES. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Criminal Division A and Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Criminal Division A

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JAINEL FONTES VAZQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KENDELL ALI

 

Court Documents

Order for Continuance Granted

Order for Continuance Granted

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Waiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Provision of Witness List

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Notice of Supplemental Discovery

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D

HEARING - Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D

Demand for Disclosure

Demand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

Demand for Discovery

Demand for Discovery; Comments: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery; Comments: WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

Notice of Discovery

Notice of Discovery

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR CHARGING DOCUMENT, AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

HEARING - Arraignment - Division A, Criminal

Information Filed

Information Filed

Complaint

Complaint

Release Order

Release Order; Comments: Pretrial Release

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Bigney, Jeanette D; Location: Room 12-C On The 12th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Bigney, Jeanette D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Bigney, Jeanette D; Location: Room 12-C On The 12th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Bigney, Jeanette D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Continuance Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance at PreTrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Provision of Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Disclosure; Comments: OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Discovery; Comments: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery; Comments: WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,; Comments: REQUEST FOR CHARGING DOCUMENT, AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Comments: Pretrial Release

    Read MoreRead Less