This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 15:43:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - THOMAS, BRANDON

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - THOMAS, BRANDON. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRANDON THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

DAVID FALSTAD

 

Court Documents

No Information Notice

No Information Notice

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Order

Order; Comments: Allowing The Office of Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel Withdraw

Order

Order; Comments: ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER WITHDRAWAL

Certificate of Conflict

Certificate of Conflict

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Recommitment to Custody

Recommitment to Custody

Order Revoking PreTrial Release-Ordering PreTrial Detention

Order Revoking PreTrial Release-Ordering PreTrial Detention

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20971723

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20971723

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

No Contact Order

No Contact Order

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020-MM-331-A-W

Complaint

Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Information Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D; Location: Ocoee Courtroom W-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Arraignment - Bigney, Jeanette D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: Allowing The Office of Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecommitment to Custody

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Revoking PreTrial Release-Ordering PreTrial Detention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • DocketBond Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20971723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond U5-20971723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo Contact Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketFirst Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOut on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2020-MM-331-A-W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALSTAD, DAVID B ESQ