This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/11/2022 at 15:11:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - TAMAYO, MILAGROS CARIDAD

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - TAMAYO, MILAGROS CARIDAD. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILAGROS CARIDAD TAMAYO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RACHEL MATTIE

 

Court Documents

Information Filed

Information Filed

Memorandum

Memorandum

Probable Cause Supporting Document

Probable Cause Supporting Document

Order Directing Clerk to Issue Capias

Order Directing Clerk to Issue Capias

Capias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

Capias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

Arrest Affidavit

Arrest Affidavit

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 811869

BOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 811869

Electronic Copy Sent to Bondsman

Electronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: RICHARD CONRAD CADOGAN - Sent 3/28/2022 1:16:58 PM

Capias Returned Executed

Capias Returned Executed

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

NOA, Written Plea of Not Guilty, Waiver of Arraignment,

Waiver of Appearance

Waiver of Appearance

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingHearing: Trial - Alvaro, Chad K; Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Trial - Alvaro, Chad K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Conference - Alvaro, Chad K; Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Conference - Alvaro, Chad K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Alvaro, Chad K (Actual: Alvaro, Chad K); Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Arraignment - Alvaro, Chad K (Actual: Alvaro, Chad K); Location: Room 6-A On the 6th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: RICHARD CONRAD CADOGAN - Sent 4/20/2022 6:10:08 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Private Attorney; Comments: Document Delivery: BRADFORD DIEBOLD FISHER ESQ - Sent 4/20/2022 5:14:24 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Waiver of Arraignment; Comments: Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Copy Sent to Bondsman; Comments: Document Delivery: RICHARD CONRAD CADOGAN - Sent 3/28/2022 1:16:58 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketBond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 811869

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArrest Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketWarrant/Capias Issued - Non Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCapias Issued Ret: Inst Bond $

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Directing Clerk to Issue Capias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbable Cause Supporting Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTIE, RACHEL