This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/27/2019 at 11:06:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - STREETER, DAMON ANTOINE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - STREETER, DAMON ANTOINE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John Marshall Kest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John Marshall Kest

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAMON ANTOINE STREETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form

Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2018CF13534AO

First Appearance Information Sheet

First Appearance Information Sheet

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: IA

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

Complaint

Complaint

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond PSE5101717

BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond PSE5101717

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE5101716

BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE5101716

BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond PSE101718

BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond PSE101718

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Bond Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond PSE5101716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 2 Surety Bond PSE5101717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond PSE101718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • First Appearance Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Insolvency and Indigency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Advice to Defendant, First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Out on Bond and Non-Monetary Release Form; Comments: 2018CF13534AO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less